Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward John Harper, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1910Born
2 Aug 193424.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Sep 193727.1Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Jun 193928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Jul 196050.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica
23 Jul 196050.0AppointedPrelate of Virgin Islands, USA
6 Oct 196050.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica
18 Oct 196050.2InstalledPrelate of Virgin Islands, USA
20 Apr 197766.7AppointedBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
18 Sep 197767.1InstalledBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
16 Oct 198575.2RetiredBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
2 Dec 199080.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward John Harper
Bishop Edward John Harper C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, NY, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained PriestEsopus, NY
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Help, Church, Brooklyn, NY, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Death PlaceSaratoga Springs, NY
Buried Place (Original)Mt. St. Alphonsus, Cemetery, Esopus, NY

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 100
  • perp/c1/i/loc: CB, 29 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 31 Jan 2019

Quantcast