Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo José Isaac Cecilio Francesco Méndez-Gonzalez, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arecibo, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1907Born
24 Jun 193528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
23 Jul 196053.1AppointedBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
28 Oct 196053.4Ordained BishopBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
21 Jan 197466.6ResignedBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
28 Jan 199587.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Arecibo, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Alfredo José Isaac Cecilio Francesco Méndez-Gonzalez
Bishop Alfredo José Isaac Cecilio Francesco Méndez-Gonzalez C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arecibo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, USA

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017