Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurício Grotto de Camargo

Archbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1957 Born
11 Apr 198123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 May 200042.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Jul 200042.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Sep 200345.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 May 200446.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Oct 200447.0SucceededBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Nov 200851.1AppointedArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Maurício Grotto de Camargo
Archbishop Maurício Grotto de Camargo (born ) Archbishop of Botucatu

EventPlace
Birth PlacePresidente Prudente

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Botucatu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,811

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast