Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlos José de Oliveira

Bishop-Elect of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1967 Born
8 Dec 199124.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 Oct 199224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1996²28.2IncardinatedPriest of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Dec 201851.1AppointedBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
19 Mar 201951.4Ordained BishopBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
6 Apr 201951.4InstalledBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlos José de Oliveira
Father Carlos José de Oliveira (born ) Bishop-Elect of Apucarana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBotucatu, Archdiocese of Botucatu, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Piedade, Church, Lençois Paulista

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Apucarana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2018
  • od: CB, 12 Dec 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 27 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 2 Jan 2019
  • c2: CB, 4 Jan 2019
  • c3+: CB, 5 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 7 Feb 2019

Quantcast