Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio de Souza, C.S.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1929 Born
1 Jul 195626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
9 Feb 197444.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Feb 197444.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Egnatia
16 Apr 197444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egnatia
20 Jul 197747.7SucceededBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Oct 200475.0RetiredBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Souza
Bishop Antônio de Souza C.S.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Assis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBom Jesus dos Perdões

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Assis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018