Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otacílio Luziano Da Silva

Bishop Emeritus of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1954 Born
6 Dec 198733.0Ordained PriestPriest of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Oct 200954.9AppointedBishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Dec 200955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Jan 201055.2InstalledBishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Oct 201863.9ResignedBishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Otacílio Luziano Da Silva
Bishop Otacílio Luziano Da Silva (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Catanduva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaracaí
Ordained BishopSagrado Coração de Jesus, Cathedral, Assis, Diocese of Assis, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Catanduva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,334
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Oct 2018

Quantcast