Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Anthony Egan

Bishop of Portsmouth, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1955 BornAltrincham
4 Aug 198428.7Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
11 Jul 201256.7AppointedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
24 Sep 201256.9Ordained BishopBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Philip Anthony Egan:
Bishop Philip Anthony Egan (born ) Bishop of Portsmouth

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Portsmouth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CL, 31 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,544

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013