Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Natalis-François Gonindard

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1838Born
21 Dec 186123.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 188547.0SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
27 Mar 188547.2ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
10 May 188547.3Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
17 May 188749.3SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
26 May 188749.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
26 May 188749.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
5 Mar 189355.1SucceededArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
17 May 189355.3DiedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Natalis-François Gonindard (VIAF: 19812164)
Archbishop Jean-Natalis-François Gonindard (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerreux
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 478, and Page 506
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 592
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017