Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Xavier Gouthe-Soulard

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1819BornSaint-Jean-la-Vêtre
29 May 184727.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 188666.5SelectedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
10 Jun 188666.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
25 Jul 188666.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
31 Aug 188667.0InstalledArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
9 Sep 190081.0DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for François Xavier Gouthe-Soulard:
Archbishop François Xavier Gouthe-Soulard (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013