Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amerigo (Ambrogio) Galbiati, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jalpaiguri

Titular Bishop of Sereddeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1889BornMonza
6 Jul 191323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
20 Mar 195262.3AppointedBishop of Jalpaiguri, India
13 Jul 195262.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jalpaiguri, India
22 Mar 196777.3RetiredBishop of Jalpaiguri, India
22 Mar 196777.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sereddeli
24 Nov 197990.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jalpaiguri, India

MicroData Summary for Amerigo (Ambrogio) Galbiati:
Bishop Amerigo (Ambrogio) Galbiati P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jalpaiguri

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015