Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Cirulli

Bishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy

Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1952 Born
7 Dec 198230.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
14 Sep 201764.9AppointedBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy
7 Dec 201765.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy
27 Dec 201765.2InstalledBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy
26 Feb 202168.4AppointedBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
14 Mar 202168.4InstalledBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Cirulli
Bishop Giacomo Cirulli (born ) Bishop of Teano-Calvi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerignola, Diocese of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola
Ordained PriestSan Domenico, Church, Cerignola, Diocese of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola
Ordained BishopSan Pietro Apostolo, Cathedral Basilica, Cerignola, Diocese of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Teano-Calvi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2017
  • ob: CB, 18 Sep 2017
  • i: CB, 27 Sep 2017
  • c2: CB, 12 Oct 2017
  • c34: CB, 7 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,612
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2021
  • i: CB, 9 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Mar 2021

Quantcast