Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Bertoli

Deceased

Chamberlain Emeritus of the Apostolic Chamber

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1908BornPoggio Garfagnana, Italy
15 Aug 193022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lucca, Italy
24 Mar 195244.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
24 Mar 195244.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Turkey
11 May 195244.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
7 May 195345.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
15 Apr 195951.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
16 Apr 196052.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
196960.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
28 Apr 196961.2Elevated to Cardinal
30 Apr 196961.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Carità
7 May 196961.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
1 Mar 197365.1ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
5 Mar 197365.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
5 May 197971.3AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
30 Jun 197971.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
25 Mar 198577.1RetiredChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
8 Nov 200193.8DiedChamberlain Emeritus of the Apostolic Chamber

MicroData Summary for Paolo Bertoli:
Cardinal Paolo Bertoli (born , died ) Chamberlain Emeritus of Apostolic Chamber

  • a priest for 71.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
  • a cardinal for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 44
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013