Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Nelson Westrupp, S.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Santo André, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1939 BornImarui
2 Feb 196222.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
28 Jun 196424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
11 May 199151.6AppointedBishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Jul 199151.8Ordained BishopBishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 Oct 200364.0AppointedBishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 May 201575.7RetiredBishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Nelson Westrupp:
Bishop José Nelson Westrupp S.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santo André

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santo André.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,643
  • r: Bollettino, 27 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 27 May 2015