Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alves da Costa, D.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1939BornCatanduva
21 Feb 196525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Christian Doctrine
3 Jan 198646.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
3 Jan 198646.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
21 Feb 198646.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
8 May 199152.1AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
21 Jul 199960.3ResignedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
4 Dec 201273.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Alves da Costa:
Bishop José Alves da Costa D.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corumbá

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013