Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilário Moser, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1931 Born
15 Aug 195826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Aug 198856.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
17 Aug 198856.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Calanae
20 Nov 198856.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Calanae
27 May 199260.4AppointedBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
15 Jun 200472.5ResignedBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hilário Moser
Bishop Hilário Moser S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tubarão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRios dos Cedros

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tubarão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast