Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Miccheli Filippetti, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Chuquibambilla, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1929Born
26 Jun 195525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
12 Aug 197647.0AppointedPrelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru
12 Aug 197647.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius
19 Sep 197647.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius
17 Jan 197848.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius
16 Jul 198656.9ResignedPrelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru
16 Jun 199464.8DiedPrelate Emeritus of Chuquibambilla, Peru

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Miccheli Filippetti
Bishop Lorenzo Miccheli Filippetti O.S.A. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Chuquibambilla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNazzano Romano, Italy

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast