Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Davino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1929BornNapoli
27 Jul 195223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
15 Jul 199363.9AppointedBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
9 Oct 199364.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
10 Nov 199768.3AppointedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
24 Mar 200575.6RetiredBishop of Palestrina, Italy
20 Jan 201181.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Palestrina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Davino:
Bishop Eduardo Davino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palestrina

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,177
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013