Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Antonino Mascarenhas Roxo, O. Praem.

Bishop Emeritus of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1928 BornSão Geraldo
20 Aug 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
18 Nov 198961.4AppointedBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Jan 199061.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 Aug 200476.1RetiredBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Antonino Mascarenhas Roxo:
Bishop Paulo Antonino Mascarenhas Roxo O. Praem. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mogi das Cruzes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mogi das Cruzes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,378
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 May 2014