Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Evangelista Martins Terra, S.J.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Bagis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1925 Born
22 Dec 195631.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 196438.9ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Aug 198863.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
17 Aug 198863.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagis
20 Nov 198863.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagis
15 Jun 199469.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
16 Jun 200479.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Evangelista Martins Terra
Bishop João Evangelista Martins Terra S.J. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brasília

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJardinópolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Brasília.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast