Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Sérgio Machado

Bishop Emeritus of São Carlos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1945 BornPatrocinio
8 Apr 197226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Jul 198943.6AppointedBishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Sep 198943.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Nov 200661.0AppointedBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Dec 201570.0ResignedBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Sérgio Machado:
Bishop Paulo Sérgio Machado (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São Carlos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Carlos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,776
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 6 Jan 2016