Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Delcusy

Deceased

Bishop of Viviers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1794BornSainte-Anastasie
8 Nov 181824.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 185762.6SelectedBishop of Viviers, France
19 Mar 185762.6ConfirmedBishop of Viviers, France
31 May 185762.8Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
17 May 187681.8DiedBishop of Viviers, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Delcusy:
Bishop Louis Delcusy (born , died ) Bishop of Viviers

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 594

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013