Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Augusto de Castro Meireles

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1885BornSão Vicente de Boim
22 Apr 190822.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 192338.3AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
29 Jun 192438.8Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
20 Jun 192842.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Porto, Portugal
20 Jun 192842.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamia
21 Jun 192943.8SucceededBishop of Porto, Portugal
29 Mar 194256.6DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Augusto de Castro Meireles:
Bishop António Augusto de Castro Meireles (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015