Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teófilo José Pereira de Andrade, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nampula, Mozambique

Titular Bishop of Urusi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1881Born
8 Apr 190524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 May 194160.3AppointedBishop of Nampula, Mozambique
29 Jun 194160.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nampula, Mozambique
17 Feb 195170.0ResignedBishop of Nampula, Mozambique
17 Feb 195170.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
25 Oct 195473.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Nampula, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Teófilo José Pereira de Andrade
Bishop Teófilo José Pereira de Andrade O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nampula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabreiros, Portugal

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast