Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ilídio Pinto Leandro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1950Born
25 Dec 197323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Viseu, Portugal
10 Jun 200655.4AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
23 Jul 200655.6Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
3 May 201867.3ResignedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
21 Feb 202069.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Ilídio Pinto Leandro (VIAF: 99517183)
Bishop Ilídio Pinto Leandro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio del Mel
Ordained BishopCathedral, Viseu, Diocese of Viseu
Death PlaceViseu, Diocese of Viseu
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Rio del Mel

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,211
  • r: Bollettino, 3 May 2018
  • d: CB, 21 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast