Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Maria Magni (Magi), O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chansi and Chensi, China

Titular Bishop of Miletopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1723²Born
22 Apr 174219.3ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
25 Jan 176340.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chansi and Chensi, China
25 Jan 176340.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
5 Nov 176542.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
10 Nov 176542.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
1777²54.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
5 Feb 178562.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chansi and Chensi, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Maria Magni (Magi)
Bishop François Maria Magni (Magi) O.F.M. Ref. (born 1723, died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chansi and Chensi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelvio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopLo-y-chien
Death PlacePeking

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,765, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 288, and Page 455
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast