Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Trenchant, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan)

Titular Bishop of Corada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1766BornVassy, France
178821.7ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
31 Dec 179024.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
8 Aug 179832.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China
1802¹35.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Corada
25 Jul 180236.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corada
18 Apr 180640.0DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Trenchant:
Bishop Pierre Trenchant M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan)

  • a priest for 15.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013