Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Alois Kessler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiraspol

Titular Archbishop of Bosporus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1862BornObrogowka
20 Apr 190441.7AppointedBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
10 Nov 190442.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
23 Jan 193067.4ResignedBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
23 Jan 193067.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bosporus
9 Dec 193371.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiraspol, Moldova

MicroData Summary for Joseph Alois Kessler:
Archbishop Joseph Alois Kessler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiraspol

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,400
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013