Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Edward Gill

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

Titular Bishop of Lambaesis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1908Born
10 Jun 193325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Seattle, Washington, USA
11 Apr 195648.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
11 Apr 195648.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
31 May 195648.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
11 Nov 197365.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Edward Gill
Bishop Thomas Edward Gill (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Seattle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeatle

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast