Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Green

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tucson, Arizona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1906BornCorning, NY
15 May 193225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tucson, Arizona, USA
29 May 195346.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
29 May 195346.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Serra
7 Sep 195347.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Serra
11 May 196053.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
28 Sep 196054.2SucceededBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
28 Jul 198175.0RetiredBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
11 May 199588.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tucson, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Green:
Bishop Francis Joseph Green (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tucson

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015