Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Archbishop Bernardin Dong Guang-qing], O.F.M. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Archbishop of Hankow [Hankou], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1917Born
1934²16.7EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
1942²24.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Mar 195840.9SelectedBishop of Hankow [Hankou], China
13 Apr 195841.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hankow [Hankou], China
1984²66.7AppointedArchbishop of Hankow [Hankou], China
12 May 200790.1DiedArchbishop of Hankow [Hankou], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardin Dong Guang-qing
Archbishop Bernardin Dong Guang-qing O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Hankow [Hankou]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Hankow, Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 1
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast