Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Li Taonan (Li Daonan)

Deceased

Bishop of Puqi [Puchi], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1902Born
15 Aug 193634.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 194946.5AppointedPrefect of Puchi [Puqi], China
17 May 195148.8AppointedBishop of Puqi [Puchi], China
24 Jun 195148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Puqi [Puchi], China
1973¹70.4DiedBishop of Puqi [Puchi], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Li Taonan (Li Daonan)
Bishop Joseph Li Taonan (Li Daonan) (born , died 1973) Bishop of Puqi [Puchi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnkiu
Ordained BishopHankow, Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,908
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 59
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 10 Jun 2020

Quantcast