Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop James Zhao Zi-ping (Chao Ziping)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1911Born
25 Aug 193726.0Ordained PriestPriest
1987²75.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
24 Apr 198876.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
Jul 1997²85.9AppointedBishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
18 May 200896.8DiedBishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Zhao Zi-ping (Chao Ziping)
Bishop James Zhao Zi-ping (Chao Ziping) (born , died ) Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManzhuang, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tsinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
Death PlaceJinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,111
  • b: CB, 21 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast