Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Paul Francis Zhang Ming-qian], O.F.M. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Yichang [Ichang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1917Born
1938²20.1EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
16 Apr 194426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Aug 195941.8Ordained BishopBishop of Yichang [Ichang], China
24 Jul 200587.7DiedBishop of Yichang [Ichang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Francis Zhang Ming-qian
Bishop Paul Francis Zhang Ming-qian O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Yichang [Ichang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJingmen City, Diocese of Yichang [Ichang]
Death PlaceYichang, Diocese of Yichang [Ichang]

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,074

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast