Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Paul Zu Zhenjiang (Xu Zhenjiang)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jul 1981Ordained BishopBishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
22 Jun 1984DiedBishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Zu Zhenjiang (Xu Zhenjiang)
Bishop Paul Zu Zhenjiang (Xu Zhenjiang) (died ) Bishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,769

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast