Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Qian (Quin) Hui-min] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1911³Born
1940²28.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 198170.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China
20 May 199382.2DiedBishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Qian (Quin) Hui-min
Bishop Joseph Qian (Quin) Hui-min (born Mar 1911, died ) Bishop of Nanjing [Nanking]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZhangjiagang
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
Death PlaceNanking, Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,768

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Sep 2020

Quantcast