Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Stephen Li Side] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1908²Born
1938²30.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 198577.0Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
9 Mar 199385.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Li Side
Bishop Stephen Li Side (born 1908, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,101
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast