Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Tarcisius Guo Ze-qian] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Hengyang [Hengchow], China


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Oct 1958SelectedBishop of Hengyang [Hengchow], China
26 Oct 1958Ordained BishopBishop of Hengyang [Hengchow], China
1977²DiedBishop of Hengyang [Hengchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tarcisius Guo Ze-qian
Bishop Tarcisius Guo Ze-qian (died 1977) Bishop of Hengyang [Hengchow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChangsha, Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,060
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • fn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast