Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Anthony Wang Zicheng (Huang Zichem)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Lixian [Lichow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1923Born
1946²22.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Dec 198764.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lixian [Lichow], China
16 Apr 1995²72.0DiedBishop of Lixian [Lichow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Wang Zicheng (Huang Zichem)
Bishop Anthony Wang Zicheng (Huang Zichem) (born , died ) Bishop of Lixian [Lichow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChangsha, Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast