Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Jin Lu-xian, S.J. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1916Born
1938²21.5EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
1945²28.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Dec 198468.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
27 Jan 198568.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
2005²88.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
27 Apr 201396.8DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Jin Lu-xian
Bishop Aloysius Jin Lu-xian S.J. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai, Vicariate Apostolic of Shanghai [Shanghai]
Ordained BishopShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]
Death PlaceShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2014, Page 1,144
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast