Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Samuel Guo Chuan-zhen], O.F.M. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jinan [Tsinan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1918Born
8 Dec 194426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1987²68.7SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
24 Apr 198870.0Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
6 Nov 201294.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jinan [Tsinan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Samuel Guo Chuan-zhen
Bishop Samuel Guo Chuan-zhen O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jinan [Tsinan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tsinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
Death PlaceJinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,112
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,831
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front), Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast