Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramon Barrera Villena

Bishop of Bayombong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1939 BornReina Mercedes
30 Mar 196324.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 198243.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tagum, Philippines
16 Mar 198243.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tucci
2 Jul 198243.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tucci
17 Aug 198546.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bayombong, Philippines
15 Sep 198647.4SucceededBishop of Bayombong, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ramon Barrera Villena:
Bishop Ramon Barrera Villena (born ) Bishop of Bayombong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bayombong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 17 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 17 Aug 2015