Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Francisco de Nevares, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Neuquén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1915BornBuenos Aires
25 Nov 195136.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Jun 196146.4AppointedBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
20 Aug 196146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
14 May 199176.3RetiredBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
19 May 199580.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Neuquén, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jaime Francisco de Nevares:
Bishop Jaime Francisco de Nevares S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Neuquén

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013