Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Viedma

Dioecesis Viedmensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Esteban María Laxague, S.D.B., Bishop
  • Miguel Esteban Hesayne, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 20 April 1934
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 89,000 (34,376 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Casilla Correo 32, Irigoyen 71, R8500BCA Viedma [Rio Negro], Argentina
  • Telephone: (02920)424.445
  • Fax: 428.945

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
20 April 1934ErectedArchdiocese of Buenos Aires Diocese of Viedma (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostDiocese of Viedma Diocese of Comodoro Rivadavia (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostDiocese of Viedma Diocese of Neuquén (erected)
22 July 1993Territory LostDiocese of Viedma Diocese of Alto Valle del Río Negro (erected)
22 July 1993Territory LostDiocese of Viedma Diocese of San Carlos de Bariloche (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950190,000220,00086.4%1580952,00011812923ap1951
1966215,000240,00089.6%2345683,1611017223ap1967
1970255,000290,00087.9%1847653,9231188324ap1971
1976284,428329,22586.4%1948674,2457312429ap1977
1980329,000401,00082.0%1840585,67216213032ap1981
1990391,000433,00090.3%2649755,2135512238ap1991
1999103,000129,00079.8%1311244,291113613ap2000
2000103,400129,50079.8%1112234,495123414ap2001
2001100,250125,23080.1%911205,012113614ap2002
2002105,000131,28680.0%711185,833113415ap2003
2003103,416131,78078.5%1110214,924104015ap2004
2004104,674132,84078.8%118195,50983915ap2005
2010115,000157,00073.2%128205,75084415ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Jun 2013