Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Comodoro Rivadavia

Dioecesis Rivadaviae



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jorge Luis Wagner, Bishop
  • Roberto Pío Álvarez, Apostolic Administrator
  • Joaquín Gimeno Lahoz, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 February 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 50,913 (19,665 Square Miles)
  • Description: Escalante, Sarmiento, and Río Senguer
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesiscomodororivadavia.org/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Rivadavia 750, U9000AKW Comodoro Rivadavia [Chubut], Argentina
  • Telephone: (0297)447.26.47
  • Fax: 406.50.92

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 February 1957ErectedDiocese of Viedma (Chubut, Santa Cruz, and Tierra del Fuego) Diocese of Comodoro Rivadavia (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostDiocese of Comodoro Rivadavia Diocese of Río Gallegos (erected)
14 March 2009Territory LostDiocese of Comodoro Rivadavia (Sagrado Corazon, Sagrada Familia, Santa María de los Ángeles (in Esquel), San Francisco de Asís (in El Maitén), Nuestra Señora of Fatima (in Lago Puelo), Inmaculada Concepción (in Gobernador Costa), along with San José (in Paso de Sapo) and La Inmaculada) Territorial Prelature of Esquel (erected)
19 October 2023Territory LostDiocese of Comodoro Rivadavia (Rawson, Biedma, Gaimán, Florentino Ameghino, Mártires, Telsen, and Gastre) Diocese of Rawson (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1964170,000185,00091.9%533384,473435617ap1967
1970123,000170,00072.4%1332452,733354314ap1971
1976176,000195,00090.3%938473,7441415219ap1977
1980188,000220,00085.5%1237493,8361394419ap1981
1990300,000350,00085.7%2024446,818284922ap1991
1999327,000387,00084.5%2821496,673247626ap2000
2000300,000356,58784.1%2722496,122288828ap2001
2001330,000390,00084.6%2422467,173268730ap2002
2002345,000412,91283.6%2618447,840228532ap2003
2003345,900412,91283.8%2618447,861228333ap2004
2004345,000412,91283.6%2516418,414198133ap2005
2006353,000422,00083.6%2514399,051177833ap2007
2013469,000604,00077.6%23113413,7942125828ap2014
2016483,186623,20077.5%2873513,8051485628ap2017
2019497,650642,77077.4%3093912,76012124429ap2020
2021507,120655,53077.4%2963514,4891364029ap2022
2023143,360242,26759.2%181197,5451611617bul:19Oct2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 49, Page 653, to Page 662

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 22 Feb 2024