Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Borgatti, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viedma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1891BornBuenos Aires
17 Jun 191624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Aug 195361.9AppointedBishop of Viedma, Argentina
25 Oct 195362.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viedma, Argentina
31 Oct 195362.1InstalledBishop of Viedma, Argentina
26 Oct 197382.1DiedBishop of Viedma, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Borgatti:
Bishop José Borgatti S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Viedma

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013