Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Alexandre de Guénet

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1688BornRouen
172739.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
26 Jan 172840.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
7 Mar 172840.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
3 Sep 176981.7DiedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Alexandre de Guénet:
Bishop Paul-Alexandre de Guénet (died ) Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières

  • a bishop for 41.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013