Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wilhelm Heinrich Heufers

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1880Born
28 May 190424.0Ordained PriestPriest
May 1933³53.0AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
Jul 1933²53.1ResignedBishop-Elect of Münster, Germany
20 Jul 194565.2DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Heinrich Heufers
Father Wilhelm Heinrich Heufers (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLippborg

  • a priest for 41.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast