Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Wilhelm Cramer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1815Born
10 Aug 183823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
13 Nov 188469.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
13 Nov 188469.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
21 Dec 188469.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
15 Mar 190388.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Wilhelm Cramer (VIAF: 22900603)
Bishop Franz Wilhelm Cramer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÖlde, Diocese of Münster
Ordained BishopCathedral, Münster, Diocese of Münster

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 70
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,562
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast