Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Von Euch

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Denmark

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1834Born
18 Jan 186025.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 188450.0AppointedPrefect of Denmark
15 Mar 189258.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Denmark
15 Mar 189258.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
8 Sep 189258.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
17 Mar 192288.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Denmark

MicroData Summary for Johannes Von Euch (VIAF: 12119182)
Bishop Johannes Von Euch (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Denmark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeppen, Germany
Ordained BishopOsnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück, Germany

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017