Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic inh Huy Quang

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1921Born
24 Dec 194524.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 197554.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam
28 Jan 199270.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Dominic inh Huy Quang
Bishop Dominic inh Huy Quang (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bắc Ninh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTu N

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,613

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast